NH HB1190 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.977
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.977
Summary
Authorizing transfer on death of motor vehicles.
Title
Authorizing transfer on death of motor vehicles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.977 | |
2010-02-10 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 17 Consent Calendar (vote 14-0); House Calendar 14, PG.598 | |
2010-02-03 | House Executive Session: 2/9/2010 10:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2010-01-12 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 1/26/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2009-12-21 | House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 6, PG.231 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2175&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |