NH HB119 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 75; Eff: 08/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 75; Eff: 08/17/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to training requirements for electrologists.
Title
Relative to training requirements for electrologists.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/18/2019; Chapter 75; Eff: 08/17/2019 |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2019 House Journal 16 P. 51 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/30/2019); Senate Journal 19 |
2019-05-10 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1828e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/08/2019 House Journal 15 P. 99 |
2019-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-1828e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/02/2019); Senate Journal 16 |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/02/2019; Senate Journal 15 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2019, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 19 |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Introduced 03/14/2019 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 9 |
2019-02-27 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/27/2019 House Journal 6 P. 10 |
2019-02-19 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/27/2019 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 13 P. 8 |
2019-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 2 P. 38 |