NH HB1185 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study forms of apprenticeship programs currently in place in New Hampshire.
Title
Establishing a committee to study forms of apprenticeship programs currently in place in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | ==CANCELLED== Hearing: 03/17/2020, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 am; Senate Calendar 11 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0614h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 17 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0614h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 17 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0614h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 11 |
2020-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 02/12/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 307 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 01/29/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services House Journal 1 P. 12 |