NH HB1185 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 18, Pg.474
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Failed on May 12 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-12 - Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 18, Pg.474
Summary
Relative to retired judges over 70 years of age.
Title
Relative to retired judges over 70 years of age.
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Bragdon [R] | Rep. Frank Emiro [R] | Rep. Mary Gorman [D] | Sen. Robert Letourneau [R] |
Rep. David Nixon [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [R] | Rep. Robert Rowe [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-12 | Senate Inexpedient to Legislate, Regular Calendar 15Y-9N, Motion Adopted, === BILL KILLED === Senate Journal 18, Pg.474 | |
2010-05-06 | Senate Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 5/12/10; Senate Calendar 19 | |
2010-04-19 | Senate Hearing: May 4, 2010, Room 103, State House, 2:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-03-03 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary | |
2010-02-17 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.987 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Beginning of Feb 17 Regular Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 10 Regular Calendar (vote 12-6); House Calendar 13, PG.537 | |
2010-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 6, PG.231 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2100&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |