NH HB1181 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate Inadvertently introduced into the Senate, without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-3; Senate Journal 10, Pg.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on February 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Senate Inadvertently introduced into the Senate, without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-3; Senate Journal 10, Pg.378
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to offers of judgments.
Title
Relative to offers of judgments.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. Brandon Giuda [R] | Sen. Gary Lambert [R] | Rep. Brian Murphy [R] |
Rep. Steven Smith [R] | Sen. Nancy Stiles [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - House - OTP (Y: 247 N: 85 NV: 18 Abs: 47) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Senate Inadvertently introduced into the Senate, without objection returned to House per Senate Rule 3-3; Senate Journal 10, Pg.378 | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Without Objection HB 1181 is Vacated from Judiciary; Senate Journal 9, Pg.349 | |
2012-02-08 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 5, Pg.122 | |
2012-02-01 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 247-85; House Journal 13, PG.780-782 | |
2012-01-25 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 5, PG.252 | |
2012-01-25 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Feb 1 (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 5, PG.252 | |
2012-01-11 | House Executive Session: 1/19/2012 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-12-27 | House Public Hearing: 1/10/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 208 | |
2011-11-14 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Judiciary; House Journal 7, PG.346 |