NH HB1181 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - House Signed by the Governor 05/25/2010; Effective 07/24/2010; Chapter 0097
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 27 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-27 - House Signed by the Governor 05/25/2010; Effective 07/24/2010; Chapter 0097
Summary
Naming a portion of route 43 after the Honorable Robert A. Johnson.
Title
Naming a portion of route 43 after the Honorable Robert A. Johnson.
Sponsors
Sen. John Barnes [R] | Rep. Frank Case [R] | Rep. Maureen Mann [D] | Rep. Susi Nord [D] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Rep. James Sullivan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | House Signed by the Governor 05/25/2010; Effective 07/24/2010; Chapter 0097 | |
2010-05-12 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-05-12 | House Enrolled; House Journal 41, PG.2097 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass 4/28/10; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-04-08 | Senate Hearing: April 22, 2010, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 15 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Transportation & Interstate Cooperation; Senate Journal 11, Pg.260 | |
2010-01-27 | House Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.509 | |
2010-01-27 | House Special Order to Beginning of Regular Calendar (Rep Bouchard): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.508 | |
2010-01-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Jan 27 Regular Calendar (vote 14-0); House Calendar 8, PG.339 | |
2010-01-13 | House Executive Session: 1/20/2010 3:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2010 2:45 PM Legislative Office Building 201 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Public Works and Highways; House Journal 6, PG.231 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2027&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |