NH HB1180 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Lay HB1180 on Table (Rep. Query): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-167 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Lay HB1180 on Table (Rep. Query): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-167 03/16/2022 House Journal 7
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state recognition of biological sex.
Title
Relative to state recognition of biological sex.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 175 N: 167 NV: 22 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 169 NV: 28 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
2022-03-16 - House - Table (Y: 167 N: 169 NV: 28 Abs: 26) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-20 | House | Lay HB1180 on Table (Rep. Query): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 175-167 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-20 | House | Amendment # 2022-0996h: Amendment Failed DV 170-170 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-20 | House | Lay HB1180 on Table (Rep. Weber): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 167-169 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0959h (Vote 11-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/08/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-22 | House | Public Hearing: 02/22/2022 9:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building210-211 |
2022-01-18 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |