NH HB1178 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to safety requirements for pools on foreclosed residential property.
Title
Relative to safety requirements for pools on foreclosed residential property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Introduced 06/16/2020, and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0167h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 130 |
2020-03-12 | House | Amendment # 2020-0167h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 130 |
2020-02-20 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2020-02-20 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0167h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 16-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 61 |
2020-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/18/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 208 |
2020-01-16 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 12 |