NH HB1174 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-132 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-132 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 42
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to energy sources for new natural gas transmission compressor stations.
Title
Relative to energy sources for new natural gas transmission compressor stations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-10 - House - ITL (Y: 198 N: 132 NV: 31 Abs: 36) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 198-132 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 42 |
2016-02-18 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 14-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 71 |
2016-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-01-20 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 01/28/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 304 |
2016-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 4 P. 4 |