NH HB1174 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - House Signed by the Governor 06/28/2010; Effective 08/27/2010; Chapter 0226
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-29 - House Signed by the Governor 06/28/2010; Effective 08/27/2010; Chapter 0226
Summary
Relative to terms for appointed town officials and relative to pay for members of park or recreation commissions.
Title
Relative to terms for appointed town officials and relative to pay for members of park or recreation commissions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-29 | House Signed by the Governor 06/28/2010; Effective 08/27/2010; Chapter 0226 | |
2010-06-02 | Senate Enrolled | |
2010-06-02 | House Enrolled | |
2010-05-19 | House House Concurs with Senate Amendment #1551s (Rep Cooney): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 46, PG.2227 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Passed by Third Reading Resolution; Senate Journal 16, Pg.353 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Ought to Pass with Amendment 1551s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 16, Pg.351 | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Committee Amendment 1551s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 16, Pg.351 | |
2010-04-22 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment 1551s, 4/28/10; Senate Calendar 17 | |
2010-04-01 | Senate Hearing: April 8, 2010, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 8:30 a.m.; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11, Pg.260 | |
2010-01-27 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0200h (New Title): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.503-504 | |
2010-01-27 | House Amendment #0200h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 12, PG.503-504 | |
2010-01-21 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #0200h (New Title); House Calendar 8, PG.357-358 | |
2010-01-21 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0200h (New Title) for Jan 27 Consent Calendar (vote 18-0); House Calendar 8, PG.334 | |
2010-01-06 | House Executive Session: 1/20/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/12/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Municipal and County Government; House Journal 6, PG.231 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2531&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |