NH HB1170 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-17 - Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repealing the death penalty in New Hampshire.
Title
Repealing the death penalty in New Hampshire.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-17 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1436s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 225 N: 104 NV: 19 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-0916h (Y: 85 N: 245 NV: 18 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-0205h (Y: 83 N: 247 NV: 18 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Laid on Table (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 12 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-17 - Senate - Floor Amendment 1436s (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - OTP (Y: 225 N: 104 NV: 19 Abs: 40) [PASS]
2014-03-12 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-0916h (Y: 85 N: 245 NV: 18 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
2014-03-12 - House - Adopt FLAM 14-0205h (Y: 83 N: 247 NV: 18 Abs: 40) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-17 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Sen. Larsen Moved Laid On Table, Motion Failed, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N: Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Failed, Regular Calendar 12Y-12N; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Sen. Lasky Floor Amendment #2014-1436s, New Title, Amendment Failed, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Hearing: 4/3/14, Representatives Hall, 9:00 a.m.; Senate Calendar 11 =LOCATION CHANGE= |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Judiciary |
2014-03-12 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 225-104 |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0916h (Rep. Vaillancourt) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 85-245 |
2014-03-12 | House | Floor Amendment #2014-0205h (New Title) (Rep. K. Murphy) Motion Failed Regular Calendar 83-247 |
2014-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for TBD (Vote 14-3; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 14 |
2014-02-05 | House | Executive Session: 2/11/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202-204 |
2013-12-13 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |