NH HB1161 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-16 - Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electronic filings of meals and rooms tax returns and interest on payments of state taxes.
Title
Relative to electronic filings of meals and rooms tax returns and interest on payments of state taxes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-16 | Senate | Vacated from Committee and Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 06/16/2020 Senate Journal 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/11/2020 and Referred to Ways and Means; Senate Journal 7 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 27 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 16 |
2020-01-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/04/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 1 P. 12 |