NH HB1161 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on February 8 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-08 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study permitting nonresident property owners to vote in local elections.
Title
Establishing a committee to study permitting nonresident property owners to vote in local elections.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Warden [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-08 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 15, PG.849 | |
2012-01-31 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 8 (Vote 13-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 6, PG.287 | |
2012-01-25 | House Executive Session: 1/31/2012 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2012-01-18 | House Public Hearing: 1/24/2012 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-10-24 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Election Law; House Journal 7, PG.345 |