NH HB116 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB116
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/12/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-06 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/12/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to personal delivery devices and mobile carriers.
Title
Relative to personal delivery devices and mobile carriers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-06 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 10/12/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-09-29 | House | Executive Session: 10/19/2021 1000am |
2021-09-15 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/28/2021 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initiallyconvened. |
2021-03-29 | House | Retained in Committee |
2021-02-19 | House | Executive Session: 02/19/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/98257633759 |
2021-01-27 | House | Public Hearing: 02/05/2021 01:45 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92807074926 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Transportation House Journal 2 P. 35 |
Same As/Similar To
HB116 (Carry Over) 2021-10-06 - Full Committee Work Session: 10/12/2021 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203