NH HB1153 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-28 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to absentee ballot requests.
Title
Relative to absentee ballot requests.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Linda Gould [R] | Rep. John Janigian [R] | Rep. Aidan Ankarberg [R] |
Rep. Kurt Wuelper [R] | Rep. Jonathan Smith [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-16 - House - OTP (Y: 185 N: 158 NV: 24 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-28 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-20 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 185-158 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/23/2022 11:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-10 | House | Public Hearing: 02/10/2022 9:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Election Law |