NH HB1152 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 17 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-21 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to verification of eligible students under the education freedom account program.
Title
Relative to verification of eligible students under the education freedom account program.
Sponsors
Rep. Bonnie Ham [R] | Rep. Brodie Deshaies [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-17 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |