NH HB1150 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0234; Section 1 & 2 Effective Date 1/1/2016; Remainder Effective 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-22 - Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0234; Section 1 & 2 Effective Date 1/1/2016; Remainder Effective 1/1/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle dealer and inspection station licenses.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle dealer and inspection station licenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-22 | House | Signed by the Governor on 7/21/2014; Chapter 0234; Section 1 & 2 Effective Date 1/1/2016; Remainder Effective 1/1/2015. |
2014-05-05 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/2014) |
2014-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 10 |
2014-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/24/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 15 |
2014-03-19 | Senate | Hearing: 3/25/14, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 1:30 p.m.; Senate Calendar 11 |
2014-03-13 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Transportation |
2014-02-19 | House | Third Reading and Passage |
2014-02-13 | House | Referral Declined by Chair of Ways and Means per House rule 46 (f) |
2014-02-12 | House | Referred to Ways and Means |
2014-02-12 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0249h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-12 | House | Adopt Amendment #0249h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0249h for Feb 12 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 9 |
2014-01-30 | House | Executive Session: 2/04/2014 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203=CONTINUED= |
2014-01-23 | House | Executive Session: 1/28/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203=RECESSED= |
2014-01-15 | House | Public Hearing: 1/21/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Transportation |