NH HB1146 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - House Lay on the Table (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1259-1260
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-10 - House Lay on the Table (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1259-1260
Summary
Eliminating requirements for additional breath tests for blood alcohol content.
Title
Eliminating requirements for additional breath tests for blood alcohol content.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-10 | House Lay on the Table (Rep Shurtleff): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 23, PG.1259-1260 | |
2010-03-03 | House Special Ordered to Next Session Without Objection; House Journal 20, PG.1180 | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass for Mar 3 (Vote 18-0; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 17, PG.819 | |
2010-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 (Continued 2/2/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 if Necessary) | |
2010-01-06 | House Public Hearing: 1/14/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-01-06 | House Introduced and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 6, PG.230 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2167&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |