NH HB1143 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1215
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to speed limits on certain residential ways.
Title
Relative to speed limits on certain residential ways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-22 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1215 | |
2012-02-15 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 22 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14, PG.808 | |
2012-02-08 | House Executive Session: 2/14/2012 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-12-14 | House Public Hearing: 1/17/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 | |
2011-10-18 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 7, PG.345 |