NH HB1130 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a commission to study the economic, legal, and sociological aspects of New Hampshire exerting its sovereign state rights.
Title
Establishing a commission to study the economic, legal, and sociological aspects of New Hampshire exerting its sovereign state rights.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2024-01-24 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/19/2024 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 10 |
2024-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2024-01-05 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2024 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to State-Federal Relations and Veterans Affairs |