NH HB1130 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 2
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to assault against an elderly person.
Title
Relative to assault against an elderly person.
Sponsors
Rep. David Love [R] | Rep. John Potucek [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/05/2020 House Journal 6 P. 2 |
2020-02-20 | House | Special Order to regular place in next calendar (Rep. Ley): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/20/2020 |
2020-02-19 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Love) 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 1 |
2020-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 17-3; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 3 |
2020-01-30 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/05/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/05/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/04/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-02 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 10 |