NH HB1120 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 267-96 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 267-96 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to teacher qualifications at charter schools.
Title
Relative to teacher qualifications at charter schools.
Sponsors
Rep. Deanna Rollo [D] | Rep. Cynthia Chase [D] | Rep. Mary Gorman [D] | Rep. June Frazer [D] |
Rep. Janet Wall [D] | Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Katherine Rogers [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-23 - House - ITL (Y: 267 N: 96 NV: 10 Abs: 25) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 267-96 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 23 |
2016-03-11 | House | Special Order to calendar of 3/23/2016: Motion Adopted DV 275-25 By Necessary Two-Thirds Vote 03/10/2016 House Journal 25 P. 117 |
2016-02-22 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass House Calendar 14 P. 89 |
2016-02-22 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 13-4; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 89 |
2016-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 02/16/2016 09:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-01-28 | House | Public Hearing: 01/28/2016 01:10 PM Legislative Office Building 207 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 3 |