NH HB1113 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 166-154 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 166-154 03/15/2022 House Journal 6
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting the department of education and the state board of education from directing or limiting school instructional options, such as remote learning.
Title
Prohibiting the department of education and the state board of education from directing or limiting school instructional options, such as remote learning.
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. Stephen Woodcock [D] | Rep. Mel Myler [D] | Rep. Sue Mullen [D] |
Rep. Arthur Ellison [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 166-154 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0878h (NT) |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-07 | House | Executive Session: 01/20/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-11-16 | House | Introduced 02/05/2022 and referred to Education |