NH HB1109 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0041; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 28 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-28 - Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0041; Effective 7/26/2014
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to providing notice to abutters of a petitioned warrant article to discontinue a class VI road.
Title
Relative to providing notice to abutters of a petitioned warrant article to discontinue a class VI road.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-28 | House | Signed by the Governor on 5/27/2014; Chapter 0041; Effective 7/26/2014 |
2014-05-01 | House | Enrolled (In recess of 4/30/14) |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled |
2014-04-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9 |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/17/14; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 14 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Hearing: 3/12/14, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 10:15 a.m.; Senate Calendar 9 |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Introduced and Referred to Public and Municipal Affairs |
2014-02-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment #0204h Motion Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-02-06 | House | Adopt Amendment #0204h Amendment Adopted Voice Vote |
2014-01-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0204h for Feb 6 (Vote 14-1; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 7 |
2014-01-16 | House | Executive Session: 1/23/2014 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 301 |
2014-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 1/16/2014 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2013-12-12 | House | Introduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Municipal and County Government |