NH HB1102 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 278; Eff. 8/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on June 26 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 278; Eff. 8/20/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enabling the department of health and human services to contract with certain certified physicians.
Title
Enabling the department of health and human services to contract with certain certified physicians.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/21/2018; Chapter 278; Eff. 8/20/2018 |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-11 | House | Enrolled 05/23/2018 |
2018-06-06 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2103e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18 |
2018-06-06 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2018-2103e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | House | Conference Committee Report 2008c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018 |
2018-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2018-2008c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2008c; 05/16/2018 |
2018-05-11 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/15/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 206 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Avard, Hennessey; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17 |
2018-05-10 | House | Speaker Appoints: Reps. Kotowski, L. Ober, LeBrun, J. MacKay 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1906s and 1933s and Requests CofC (Rep. Kotowski): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2018-1906s and 2018-1933s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Without Objection, the Clerk is authorized to make technical and administrative corrections which are necessary to reflect the intent of the Senate, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Floor Amendment # 2018-1933s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Pending Motion Ought to Pass with Amendment #2018-1906s; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. Carson Floor Amendment # 2018-1906s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Withdraws Floor Amendment # 2018-1930s; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Sen. D'Allesandro Offered Floor Amendment # 2018-1930s; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Special Order to the end of the calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/03/2018; |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Special Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15 |
2018-04-30 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19A |
2018-04-20 | Senate | Hearing: 04/24/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:15 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-1682s; Senate Calendar 18A |
2018-04-19 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/19/2018; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-22 | Senate | Hearing: 03/27/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0741h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 45 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0741h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 45 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0741h (NT) for 03/06/2018 (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 25 |
2018-02-21 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-02-07 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/20/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-31 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-11 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Public Hearing: 01/31/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-03 | House | ==CANCELLED== Public Hearing: 01/17/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 2 |