NH HB1101 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-09-20 - Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibiting charges to New Hampshire residents for the construction of high pressure gas pipelines.
Title
Prohibiting charges to New Hampshire residents for the construction of high pressure gas pipelines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-09-20 | House | Executive Session: 10/12/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-08-18 | House | Interim Study Subcommittee Work Session: 09/08/2016 10:05 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-03-09 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 67 |
2016-03-03 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/09/2016 (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 43 |
2016-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 03/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-03 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 02/16/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-03 | House | ==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/16/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-02-03 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 02/02/2016 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 202 |
2016-01-20 | House | ==RECESSED== Public Hearing: 01/19/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building202 |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Ways and Means House Journal 4 P. 2 |