NH HB110 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.518
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.518
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring professional safety and security services personnel to report certain criminal offenses.
Title
Requiring professional safety and security services personnel to report certain criminal offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.518 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing: 5/26/11, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 1:00 p.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-13 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 13, Pg.258 | |
2011-02-15 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0133h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.364-365 | |
2011-02-15 | House Amendment #0133h Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 17, PG.364-365 | |
2011-02-03 | House Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; House Calendar 13, PG.234 | |
2011-02-03 | House Proposed Majority Committee Amendment #2011-0133h; House Calendar 13, PG.256 | |
2011-02-03 | House Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0133h for Feb 15 (Vote 14-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 13, PG.234 | |
2011-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/3/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-25 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/1/2011 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-11 | House Public Hearing: 1/20/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2011-01-03 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 8, PG.130 |