NH HB109 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 218-162 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 12 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-09-18 - Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 218-162 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 7
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.
Title
Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-09-18 - House - Veto Override (Y: 218 N: 162 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - House - Concur (Y: 196 N: 161 NV: 6 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Hennessey Floor Amendment 2244s (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - OTP (Y: 203 N: 148 NV: 15 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Table (Y: 147 N: 202 NV: 17 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 92 N: 237 NV: 36 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2019-06-13 - House - Concur (Y: 196 N: 161 NV: 6 Abs: 35) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Senate - Sen. Hennessey Floor Amendment 2244s (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - OTP (Y: 203 N: 148 NV: 15 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Table (Y: 147 N: 202 NV: 17 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 92 N: 237 NV: 36 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-09-18 | House | Veto Sustained 09/18/2019: Regular Calendar 218-162 Lacking Necessary Two-Thirds Vote House Journal 21 P. 7 |
2019-08-12 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 08/09/2019 |
2019-07-12 | House | Enrolled 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 56 |
2019-07-10 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-07-02 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2656e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/27/2019 House Journal 20 P. 54 |
2019-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2019-2656e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/27/2019); Senate Journal 21 |
2019-06-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2244s (Rep. Cushing): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 196-161 06/13/2019 House Journal 19 P. 2 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2019-2244s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Sen. Hennessey Floor Amendment # 2019-2244s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-23 | Senate | Special Order to the beginning of the regular calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Hearing: 04/30/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 20 |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Introduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12 |
2019-03-19 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-148 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 85 |
2019-03-19 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Welch): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 147-202 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 85 |
2019-03-19 | House | FLAM # 2019-1101h (Rep. B. Griffin): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 92-237 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 85 |
2019-03-13 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2019-03-13 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 23 |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-01-16 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2018-12-26 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 38 |