NH HB109 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring background checks for commercial firearms sales.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-19 - House - OTP (Y: 203 N: 148 NV: 15 Abs: 34) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - Table (Y: 147 N: 202 NV: 17 Abs: 34) [FAIL]
2019-03-19 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 92 N: 237 NV: 36 Abs: 35) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Senate Calendar 23
2019-04-24SenateHearing: 04/30/2019, Room 100, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 20
2019-03-29SenateIntroduced 03/28/2019 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12
2019-03-19HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 203-148 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 85
2019-03-19HouseLay on Table (Rep. Welch): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 147-202 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 85
2019-03-19HouseFLAM # 2019-1101h (Rep. B. Griffin): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 92-237 03/19/2019 House Journal 10 P. 85
2019-03-13HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2019-03-13HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/19/2019 (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 16 P. 23
2019-02-13HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2019 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204
2019-01-16House==ROOM CHANGE== Public Hearing: 02/13/2019 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208
2018-12-26HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 2 P. 38

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback