NH HB1080 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13
Pending: Senate Executive Departments and Administration Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the legislative youth advisory council.
Title
Relative to the legislative youth advisory council.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/03/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 13 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0944h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2024-0944h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 |
2024-03-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0944h (NT) 03/06/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2024-01-31 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/15/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2024-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2024 10:20 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Legislative Administration |