NH HB108 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB108
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the confidentiality of reports made to the division of children, youth, and families and requiring guardians ad litem be appointed in certain instances.
Title
Relative to the confidentiality of reports made to the division of children, youth, and families and requiring guardians ad litem be appointed in certain instances.
Sponsors
Rep. James Spillane [R] | Rep. Terry Roy [R] | Rep. Bill Boyd [R] | Rep. Debra DeSimone [R] |
Rep. Vanessa Sheehan [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Senate | Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15 |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 05/18/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 22 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:00 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 214-143 02/22/2023 House Journal 6 P. 64 |
2023-02-15 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2023-02-15 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/07/2023 (Vote 9-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 12 P. 16 |
2023-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-12-23 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Children and Family Law |
Same As/Similar To
HB108 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/18/2023; Senate Journal 15