NH HB1074 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Berry): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-185 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 28 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Berry): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-185 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 51
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to campaign contributions by limited liability companies.
Title
Relative to campaign contributions by limited liability companies.
Sponsors
Rep. Kat McGhee [D] | Rep. Connie Lane [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 191 N: 185 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | House | Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Berry): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-185 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 51 |
2024-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2024-0630h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 50 |
2024-03-11 | House | Committee Report: Without Recommendation 02/13/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar) |
2024-02-07 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2024 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-31 | House | Public Hearing: 02/06/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2023-11-28 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Election Law |