NH HB1062 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 23; EFF.06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 20 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-20 - Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 23; EFF.06/17/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the duties of the electrology advisory committee.
Title
Relative to the duties of the electrology advisory committee.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 04/18/2022; Chapter 23; EFF.06/17/2022 |
2022-04-08 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 03/31/2022 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 03/31/2022); Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing: 03/09/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-23 | House | Amendment # 2022-0211h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0211h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0211h (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 01/18/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building302-304 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-11-02 | House | To Be Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |