NH HB1060 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1618s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-24 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1618s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to establishing a geologic resources committee.
Title
Relative to establishing a geologic resources committee.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] | Rep. Judy Aron [R] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-24 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2024-1618s, 05/02/2024; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-04-17 | Senate | Hearing: 04/23/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Introduced 02/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |
2024-02-01 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 10 |
2024-01-18 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 01/17/2024 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 9 |
2024-01-18 | House | Executive Session: 01/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2024-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/17/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development |