NH HB1053 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-20 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the hourly rate paid to an employee for hours worked but not previously scheduled.
Title
Relative to the hourly rate paid to an employee for hours worked but not previously scheduled.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-20 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 18-3; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-24 | House | Executive Session: 02/24/2022 11:30 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2022-01-27 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 01/27/2022 09:30 am State HouseReps Hall |
2022-01-20 | House | Public Hearing: 01/20/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building305-307 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |