NH HB105 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-11-12 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 10
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to special number plates for members of the Civil Air Patrol.
Title
Relative to special number plates for members of the Civil Air Patrol.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] | Rep. Timothy Smith [D] | Rep. Alfred Baldasaro [R] | Rep. Richard Marston [R] |
Rep. Josh Moore [R] | Rep. Donald LeBrun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-11-12 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Jan 6 (Vote 11-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 67, PG. 10 |
2015-10-14 | House | Executive Session: 10/20/2015 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-10-07 | House | Retained Bill - Full Committee Work Session: 10/13/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-05-13 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 5/20/2015 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-29 | House | Retained in Committee |
2015-01-26 | House | ==RESCHEDULED== Executive Session: 1/28/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-21 | House | ==POSTPONED== Executive Session: 1/27/2015 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to Transportation; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |