NH HB1042 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring certain health advisory notices to be provided to renters of vacation or recreational rental units.
Title
Requiring certain health advisory notices to be provided to renters of vacation or recreational rental units.
Sponsors
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Rep. Christy Bartlett [D] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] | Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] |
Rep. John MacDonald [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 21-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/03/2022 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/13/2022 03:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2021-11-02 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Judiciary |