NH HB1040 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-15 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to including interest in an abated property tax refund at the rate determined by the department of revenue administration.
Title
Relative to including interest in an abated property tax refund at the rate determined by the department of revenue administration.
Sponsors
Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-15 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/15/2024 House Journal 5 P. 14 |
2024-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/07/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 6 P. 8 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2024 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Municipal and County Government |