NH HB1031 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-02-01 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to motor vehicle certificate of title exemptions.
Title
Relative to motor vehicle certificate of title exemptions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-01 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/01/2024 House Journal 3 P. 12 |
2024-01-25 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate 01/16/2024 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 4 P. 11 |
2024-01-11 | House | Executive Session: 01/16/2024 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 203 House Calendar 2 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/09/2024 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Transportation |