NH HB1023 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-07 - Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 18
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to requiring employers to provide notice of resources available to support veterans with post traumatic stress disorder (PTSD).
Title
Relative to requiring employers to provide notice of resources available to support veterans with post traumatic stress disorder (PTSD).
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2024 House Journal 7 P. 18 |
2024-02-20 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study 02/07/2024 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 11 |
2024-01-31 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 307 |
2024-01-04 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-11-27 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Labor, Industrial and Rehabilitative Services |