NH HB1022 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1022
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permitting pharmacists to dispense the drug Ivermectin by means of a standing order and establishing a commission to study the use of Ivermectin to treat Covid-19.
Title
Permitting pharmacists to dispense the drug Ivermectin by means of a standing order and establishing a commission to study the use of Ivermectin to treat Covid-19.
Sponsors
Rep. Leah Cushman [R] | Rep. Jim Kofalt [R] | Rep. Vanessa Sheehan [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] |
Rep. Melissa Blasek [R] | Rep. Peter Torosian [R] | Rep. Tina Harley [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-12 - House - Concur (Y: 157 N: 148 NV: 27 Abs: 57) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - OTPA (Y: 183 N: 159 NV: 24 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 10 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2022-05-05 - Senate - Committee Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-16 - House - OTPA (Y: 183 N: 159 NV: 24 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Vetoed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-14 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted DV 157-148 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendments 2022-1867s and 2022-1977s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2022-1977s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Sen. Sherman Floor Amendment # 2022-1922s, Regular Calendar 10Y-14N, Amendment Failed; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1867s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1867s, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-07 | Senate | Hearing: 04/13/2022, Room 100, State House, 08:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0964h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 183-159 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-17 | House | Amendment # 2022-0964h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/16/2022 House Journal 7 |
2022-03-09 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-03-09 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0964 (Vote 11-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-12 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-10-29 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
HB1022 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Vetoed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022 House Journal 14