NH HB101 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-151; House Journal 16, PG. 322-324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 7 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-11 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-151; House Journal 16, PG. 322-324
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prescription refills.
Title
Relative to prescription refills.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-11 - House - Inexpedient to Legislate (Y: 191 N: 151 NV: 52 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-11 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 191-151; House Journal 16, PG. 322-324 |
2015-02-11 | House | Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep D. McGuire); House Journal 16, PG. 298 |
2015-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 11 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar11, PG. 173 |
2015-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 2/3/2015 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-14 | House | Public Hearing: 1/20/2015 11:15 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 |
2015-01-07 | House | Introduced and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 7, PG. 117 |