NH HB101 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 304-51; House Journal 16, PG.317-319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-02-09 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 304-51; House Journal 16, PG.317-319
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to industrial hemp and establishing an industrial hemp special program fund.
Title
Relative to industrial hemp and establishing an industrial hemp special program fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Derek Owen [D] | Rep. Tara Sad [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-02-09 - House - ITL (Y: 304 N: 51 NV: 44 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-09 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 304-51; House Journal 16, PG.317-319 | |
2011-01-25 | House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 9 (Vote 11-7; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 10, PG.150 | |
2011-01-18 | House Executive Session: 1/25/2011 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 308 | |
2011-01-04 | House Public Hearing: 1/18/2011 2:00 PM Legislative Office Building 303 | |
2010-12-30 | House Introduced 1/5/2011 and Referred to Environment and Agriculture; House Journal 8, PG.130 |