NH CACR4 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Redistricting. Providing that an independent redistricting commission shall be established to draw boundaries for state and federal offices.
Title
Redistricting. Providing that an independent redistricting commission shall be established to draw boundaries for state and federal offices.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-18 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-02-18 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 69 |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive Session: 02/17/2021 01:30 pm Please click the link below to join the webinar:https://zoom.us/j/95842759377 |
2021-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/12/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://zoom.us/j/95709405955 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Election Law House Journal 2 P. 47 |