NH CACR22 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Pending: House Election Law Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the New Hampshire presidential primary. Providing that the New Hampshire presidential primary shall be the first presidential primary of a presidential election cycle.
Title
Relating to the New Hampshire presidential primary. Providing that the New Hampshire presidential primary shall be the first presidential primary of a presidential election cycle.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-01-18 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/19/2024 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-06 | House | Public Hearing: 03/11/2024 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2024-03-02 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 02/22/2024 and referred to Election Law |
2024-01-18 | Senate | Ought to Pass, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted, by Necessary 3/5; OT3rdg; 01/18/2024 Senate Journal 2 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 01/18/2024, Vote 5-0; Senate Calendar 3 |
2023-12-14 | Senate | Hearing: 01/09/2024, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 48 |
2023-12-13 | Senate | To Be Introduced 01/03/2024 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 1 |