NH CACR12 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 20 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-06-01 - Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to public education. Providing that the general court shall have the authority to define standards for public education, establish standards of accountability, mitigate local disparities in educational opportunity and fiscal capacity, and have full discretion to determine the amount of state funding for education.
Title
Relating to public education. Providing that the general court shall have the authority to define standards for public education, establish standards of accountability, mitigate local disparities in educational opportunity and fiscal capacity, and have full discretion to determine the amount of state funding for education.
Sponsors
Rep. David Bettencourt [R] | Sen. Jeb Bradley [R] | Rep. John Graham [R] | Rep. David Hess [R] |
Rep. Shawn Jasper [R] | Rep. Neal Kurk [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-16 - House - OTP/AM 0613H(NT) (Y: 252 N: 113 NV: 33 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-01 | Senate Rereferred to Committee, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Senate Journal 19, Pg.517 | |
2011-05-26 | Senate Committee Report: Rereferred to Committee, 6/1/11; Senate Calendar 26 | |
2011-05-05 | Senate Hearing: 5/11/11, Room 100, State House, 2:15 p.m.; Senate Calendar 23 | |
2011-04-20 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Internal Affairs; Senate Journal 14, Pg.272 | |
2011-03-16 | House Reconsideration (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Failed Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.881 | |
2011-03-16 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0613h(NT): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 252-113 by Constitutionally Required Three-Fifths; House Journal 28, PG.878-881 | |
2011-03-16 | House Amendment #0613h (New Title) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 28, PG.878-879 | |
2011-03-16 | House Special Order to Next Order of Business (Rep Bettencourt): Motion Adopted Division Vote 255-102; House Journal 28, PG.878 | |
2011-03-10 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2011-0613h (New Title); House Calendar 23, PG.580-581 | |
2011-03-10 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0613h(NT) for Mar 15 (Vote 12-2; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 22, PG.565 | |
2011-03-02 | House Continued Public Hearing: 3/9/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 203 ==Executive session to follow== | |
2011-02-24 | House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 3/4/2011 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-24 | House Full Committee Work Session: 3/4/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 207 | |
2011-02-24 | House ==CANCELLED== Continued Public Hearing: 3/3/2011 9:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 305 | |
2011-02-08 | House Public Hearing: 2/18/2011 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205-207 ==RECESSED== | |
2011-01-25 | House Introduced 1/6/2011 and Referred to Special Committee on Education Funding Reform; House Journal 11, PG. 196 |