NE LR98 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-18 - President/Speaker signed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Support the call to action of the My Brother's Keeper Initiative and Community Challenge to address opportunity gaps faced by boys and young men of color nationwide
Title
Support the call to action of the My Brother's Keeper Initiative and Community Challenge to address opportunity gaps faced by boys and young men of color nationwide
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2017-05-18 | Legislature | Adopted |
2017-05-17 | Legislature | Reported to the Legislature for further consideration |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 17, 2017 |
2017-05-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 23, 2017 (cancel) |
2017-05-09 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 23, 2017 |
2017-04-11 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Laid over |
2017-04-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=32945 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR98.pdf |