NE LR517 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-03 - Notice of hearing for October 25, 2012
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-03 - Notice of hearing for October 25, 2012
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the benefits of adult day service programs currently provided to Nebraska seniors
Title
Interim study to examine the benefits of adult day service programs currently provided to Nebraska seniors
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-03 | Notice of hearing for October 25, 2012 | |
2012-03-30 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-03-21 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2012-03-21 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=17361 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR517.pdf |