NE LR30 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for continuation of the Health Care Reform Implementation and Oversight Committee
Title
Provide for continuation of the Health Care Reform Implementation and Oversight Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-01-04 | Title printed. Carryover resolution | |
2011-01-28 | Notice of hearing for February 17, 2011 | |
2011-01-19 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2011-01-14 | Speaker's announcement | |
2011-01-14 | Laid over | |
2011-01-14 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12189 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR30.pdf |