NE LR22 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Resolution for an amendment to the United States Constitution providing for repeal of federal law or regulation by vote of two-thirds of state legislatures
Title
Resolution for an amendment to the United States Constitution providing for repeal of federal law or regulation by vote of two-thirds of state legislatures
Sponsors
Sen. Tony Fulton [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2011-02-16 | Notice of hearing for March 10, 2011 | |
2011-01-14 | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee | |
2011-01-12 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=12536 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LR22.pdf |